Financial history DOODLEAID

Charity number: 1168409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £36.26k £31.51k £39.05k £39.45k £39.85k
Total expenditure £29.55k £18.83k £18.21k £18.29k £20.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A