BRISTOL SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1168123
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To enable persons in the City of Bristol, Greater Bristol, South Gloucester and the surrounding area as well as elsewhere who are experiencing feelings of distress or despair, including those who may be at risk of suicide, to receive confidential emotional support at any time of the day or night in order to improve their emotional health and to reduce the incidence of suicide.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £34,779
Total expenditure: £61,740

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 May 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE SAMARITANS OF BRISTOL BRANCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Mead Chair 21 October 2024
None on record
Felicity Bates Trustee 27 March 2025
None on record
Helen Slater Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Lawrence Goodwin Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Hana Canter Trustee 25 April 2024
None on record
Jack Burrows Trustee 20 January 2024
None on record
Samanthi Dealwis Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
KARIN BURNETT Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.26k £43.39k £38.37k £83.15k £34.78k
Total expenditure £60.14k £37.22k £54.69k £71.15k £61.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.92k £4.85k £914 £7.40k £4.08k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 07 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 10 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
RULES APPROVED 24/09/64 AS AMENDED ON 12/11/91 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/02 AS AMENDED ON 08/10/03 AS AMENDED ON 09/10/06 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/07 AS AMENDED ON 29/10/15
Charitable objects
TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL, GREATER BRISTOL, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO THE AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING .
Area of benefit
CITY OF BRISTOL, GREATER BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Registration history
  • 11 May 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Samaritans
37 St. Nicholas Street
Bristol
BS1 1TP
Phone:
01179279387