Accounts and annual returns PILLAR OF FIRE INTERCESSION GROUP OF PRAYERS

Charity number: 1171920
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 November 2023 07 October 2024 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2023 07 October 2024 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 04 November 2022 23 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 04 November 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 04 November 2020 20 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 November 2019 13 April 2021 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 November 2019 Not Required