Financial history THE GOWER SOCIETY

Charity number: 1172919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £213.69k £105.15k £97.19k £212.48k £186.71k
Total expenditure £143.01k £97.61k £102.11k £142.96k £127.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A