THE GOWER SOCIETY

Charity number: 1172919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is currently dormant and expected to commence activities in the year to 31st December 2019.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £186,708
Total expenditure: £127,738

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Swansea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 October 1969: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • CYFEILLION GWYR (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malcolm Ernest Ridge Chair 24 October 2020
None on record
Wyn Davies Trustee 20 May 2023
None on record
Ruth Ridge Trustee 20 May 2023
SWANSEA PHILHARMONIC CHOIR
Received: On time
Jeannette McLellan Trustee 24 October 2020
None on record
John Vivian Tucker Trustee 24 October 2019
THE ROYAL INSTITUTION OF SOUTH WALES
Received: On time
Richard Ian Bevan-Jones Trustee 24 October 2019
None on record
GRUFFYDD ROLANT AP GWENT Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
GORDON ROBERT HOWE Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
JILL EILEEN BURGESS Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record
Thomas Rice Mansel Methuen-Campbell Trustee 24 June 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £213.69k £105.15k £97.19k £212.48k £186.71k
Total expenditure £143.01k £97.61k £102.11k £142.96k £127.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 November 2023 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 10 November 2023 10 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH MARCH 1956 AS AMENDED 15 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 2018 as amended on 05 May 2018 as amended on 27 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
"3.2 The objects of the charity, and for the public benefit, are: 3.2.1 to promote the preservation, conservation and enhancement of the physical and natural environment of the area known as Gower by promoting: (a) the natural beauty of Gower; (b) the preservation ,protection, development, improvement and care of the land, buildings, antiquities, architecture, traditions and features of historic or public interest; (c) high standards of planning in or affecting Gower; (d) the encouragement of the inhabitants of Gower and the surrounding area and the public at large to take an active interest in the enjoyment and protection of Gower and its heritage; 3.2.2 promote and further the study and recording of Gower's antiquities, traditions, history, geography and natural history, and to further the education of the public in respect of the same; 3.2.3 to preserve, protect and promote rights of way and access to Gower's open spaces; and 3.2.4 to use the income and property of the Charity to pay to or otherwise fund other charitable organisations whose objects are identical or similar to the Charity, in particular, any charitable organisation to which the Charity is linked. 3.3 For the purpose of the said Objects in clause 3.2 above, the area known as Gower shall include the whole of the Lordship of Gower. 3.4 Nothing in this constitution shall authorise the application of the property of the Charity for purposes which are not charitable"
Area of benefit
GOWERTON
Registration history
  • 07 October 1969 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
4 Longfields
Bethany Lane
West Cross
SWANSEA
SA3 5UB
Phone:
01792 402216