Financial history SWINDON CHILDRENS SCRAPSTORE

Charity Number: 1168574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £409.12k £392.84k £313.39k £283.69k £226.39k
Total expenditure £225.54k £215.47k £240.34k £248.99k £260.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £66.73k £15.00k £5.00k N/A