SWINDON CHILDRENS SCRAPSTORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES (II) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIROMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ranjit Sihra | Trustee | 02 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Huggins | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Connell | Trustee | 11 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cheney | Trustee | 27 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £409.12k | £392.84k | £313.39k | £283.69k | £226.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £225.54k | £215.47k | £240.34k | £248.99k | £260.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £66.73k | £15.00k | £5.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (II) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SWINDON AND SURROUNDING AREAS, IN PARTICULAR BY: A) COLLECTING, STORAGE AND REDISTRIBUTION OF REUSABLE WASTE FOR ART, CRAFT AND PLAY; B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND PROMOTING THE BENEFITS OF ALL ASPECTS OF WASTE RE-USE; C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WASTE ITEMS FOR RE-USE; D) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING OR RETRAINING AND WORK EXPERIENCE IN WASTE RE-USE AND RELATED ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Swindon Childrens Scrapstore
Unit 7
Bramble Close
Elgin Industrial Estate
Swindon
SN2 8DW
- Phone:
- 01793513982
- Email:
- swss@scrapstore.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window