THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY EDWINSTOWE

Charity number: 1171553
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £117,777
Total expenditure: £111,466

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 February 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EDWINSTOWE PCC (Working name)
  • ST MARY'S CHURCH EDWINSTOWE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Matthew Storor Trustee 30 April 2023
CHARITY COTTAGES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH OF JOHN BELLAMY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ANN MONDAY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ANN MONDAY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Julie Louise Readman Trustee 30 April 2023
None on record
Linda Foster Trustee 10 January 2023
None on record
Denise Poole Trustee 08 November 2022
None on record
Harold Green Trustee 22 May 2022
None on record
Brian William Evans Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Ruth Roddison Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
Darren Knight Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record
Peter George Edwards Trustee 16 May 2021
None on record
Walter Daglish Trustee 16 May 2021
ANN MONDAY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ANN MONDAY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
CHARITY COTTAGES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH OF JOHN BELLAMY'S CHARITY
Received: On time
THE THORESBY COLLIERY BAND
Received: On time
Emma Scaysbrook Trustee 10 September 2019
None on record
Margaret Share Trustee 29 April 2018
None on record
Sue Ford Trustee 30 April 2017
None on record
HILARY AILSA CHESHIRE Trustee 10 January 2017
None on record
RICHARD NEELY Trustee 24 April 2016
ANN MONDAY EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
CHARITY COTTAGES RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ANN MONDAY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ELEEMOSYNARY BRANCH OF JOHN BELLAMY'S CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £113.49k £119.74k £108.44k £98.17k £117.78k
Total expenditure £115.53k £142.20k £94.65k £106.27k £111.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.33k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 18 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 November 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 November 2023 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 February 2023 110 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 February 2023 110 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 10 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St Mary's Parish Office
Unit 1 Church Farm Business Centre
Mansfield Road
Edwinstowe
MANSFIELD
Nottingh
Phone:
01623822430