ST BARNABAS CHURCH (BECKENHAM)

Charity number: 1169952
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- Regular public worship open to all - The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation - Pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved - Teaching of Christianity through sermons and small groups - Promotion of Christianity through the distribution of literature - Supporting other charities in the UK and overseas

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £41,616
Total expenditure: £113,484

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 October 2016: Standard registration
  • 11 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
  • 11 January 2022: Funds transferred to 1197407 THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ST BARNABAS (BECKENHAM) PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £107.29k £110.18k £114.56k £41.62k
Total expenditure £123.08k £121.39k £144.46k £113.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 26 May 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 26 May 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 May 2018 On Time