DYSLEXIA SPARKS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dyslexia Sparks offers support to individuals of all ages with dyslexia and related SPLDs. We provide dyslexia and dyscalculia assessments to children and adults via private referral. We offer specialist tuition to children and adults to develop literacy and maths skills, as well as study skills, time management and report-writing. We provide teacher training as well as support to organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 09 August 2016: CIO registration
- 25 January 2020: Funds received from 514015 FRIENDS OF THE DYSLEXIA INSTITUTE (HULL)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Cavanagh | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Warner | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernadette Holbrook | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.89k | £190.11k | £187.34k | £220.72k | £227.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.34k | £179.30k | £184.31k | £201.69k | £208.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 15 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 03 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 09 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF INDIVIDUALS WITH SPECIFIC LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND RELATED CONCERNS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO: DYSLEXIA, DYSCALCULIA, DYSPRAXIA, ADHD AND ASD, BY: - PROVIDING INFORMATION AND GUIDANCE TO INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER BODIES; - PROVIDING DETAILED INFORMATION REGARDING SPECIFIC NEEDS AND RECOMMENDED SUPPORT VIA THE USE OF RELEVANT ASSESSMENT TOOLS; - PROVIDING TUTORING AND GUIDANCE TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED OF SPECIALIST SUPPORT; - OBTAINING, COLLECTING AND RECEIVING MONIES AND FUNDS BY WAY OF CONTRIBUTIONS, DONATIONS, LEGACIES, GRANTS AND ANY OTHER LAWFUL METHODS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dyslexia Sparks
Dunston House
Livingstone Road
HESSLE
HU13 0EG
- Phone:
- 01482 234856
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window