Accounts and annual returns THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD - OVERCOMERS HOUSE AVONMOUTH.

Charity number: 1169512
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 February 2024 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required