THE KENDAL (KIRKLAND) TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The furtherance of any religious and charitable purposes in connection with the Parish Church of the Holy Trinity Kendal (Kendal Parish Church) for the benefit of members of the Church of England resident in the parish. The Trust owns and lets the former Kirkland School Buildings to private individuals and organisations at an hourly rate as meeting and function rooms for sundry purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 February 1979: Standard registration
- 08 February 2019: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 08 February 2019: Funds transferred to 1176972 THE KENDAL (KIRKLAND) TRUST
- KIRKLAND TRUST (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.92k | £71.09k | £69.83k | £59.42k | £158.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.55k | £85.28k | £82.94k | £67.11k | £173.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 20 April 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 20 April 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 30 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 31 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 31 May 2016 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3/02/1977
Charitable objects
1) FOR THE FURTHERANCE OF ANY RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE PARISH CHURCH 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND RESIDENT IN THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY, KENDAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window