GAINSHARE ACCOUNT RAF HALTON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the Royal Air Force RAF Halton Gainshare is: The promotion of military efficiency by the provision and support of mess, social, sporting and other facilities for the efficiency and well-being of Servicemen and Servicewomen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 July 2016: Standard registration
- 25 January 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182.53k | £82.12k | £67.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.90k | £146.52k | £88.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 August 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2019
(These accounts |
03 August 2020 | 4 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 18 February 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 18 February 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 27 February 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2017
(These accounts |
27 February 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 MAR 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICE PERSONNEL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window