Financial history THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF ST. HUBERT IDSWORTH TRUST

Charity number: 1168533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £55.35k £98.10k £213.64k £6.96k £27.02k
Total expenditure £50.48k £3.36k £5.14k £12.61k £23.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £51.00k £1.00k £1.50k £1.00k £2.00k