BRIDGEND MALE CHOIR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridgend Male Choir a larger Welsh male choir which performs concerts to assist in fund raising for charities throughout the UK and to promote choral singing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 February 1979: Standard registration
- BRIDGEND MALE CHOIR (Working name)
- BRIDGEND AND DISTRICT MALE CHOIR (Previous name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Owen | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Johnson | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Deeley | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN HOPKINS JOHN | Trustee | 16 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Russell Lewis | Trustee | 17 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GARETH REESE | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR JIMMY THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.52k | £35.68k | £6.52k | £32.72k | £56.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.86k | £42.93k | £5.18k | £28.56k | £51.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 December 2021 | 124 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 12 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 12 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1978 AMENDED 15 JANUARY 1987. as amended on 16 Nov 2017
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE ART OF CHORAL MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF CHORAL CONCERTS AND SIMILAR ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 BRYN ROAD
COYCHURCH
BRIDGEND
CF35 5EY
- Phone:
- 01656862037
- Email:
- reesegj@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window