Trustees Prout Bridge Project

Charity number: 1169903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Angela Joy Dupont MBE DL Trustee 10 December 2024
BEAMINSTER YARN BARTON COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD
Received: On time
Gillian Fearnyough Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Lindsay Noble Trustee 10 December 2024
None on record
Rebekah Agnes Hillman Trustee 07 November 2023
None on record
Richard William Barker Trustee 05 September 2023
None on record
Donna Marie Berry Trustee 11 October 2022
None on record
Victoria Park Trustee 16 January 2019
None on record
Joanna Frances Robins Trustee 20 August 2018
None on record