Financial history EGTON VILLAGE HALL CIO

Charity Number: 1168907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £12.60k £10.49k £2.88k £2.93k £4.11k
Total expenditure £5.01k £3.17k £3.42k £5.32k £5.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £335
Income from government grants £10.00k £9.72k N/A N/A N/A