Financial history BECCLES U3A

Charity number: 1168510
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.86k £11.28k £14.29k £11.80k £12.90k
Total expenditure £12.00k £9.61k £13.65k £13.28k £12.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A