BECCLES U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charitable purpose of the U3A is: To advance education and in particular the education of people not in full time gainful employment who are in their third age (being the period of time after the first age of childhood dependence and the second age of full time employment and/or parental responsibility) residing in Beccles and its surrounding locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 29 July 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillipa Holliday | Chair | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Crawford | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Muriel Pearl Gurbutt | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Russell Charles Gascoyne | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Waldron | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Skipper | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Caroline Emes | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Susanne Dack | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Moore | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Wood | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Kettless | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.86k | £11.28k | £14.29k | £11.80k | £12.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.00k | £9.61k | £13.65k | £13.28k | £12.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 February 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 11 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Marsh Lane
Worlingham
BECCLES
Suffolk
NR34 7PE
- Phone:
- 07443874246
- Email:
- becclesu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window