Trustees BECCLES U3A
Charity number: 1168510

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillipa Holliday | Chair | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Janet Mary Crawford | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Muriel Pearl Gurbutt | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Russell Charles Gascoyne | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Waldron | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Skipper | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Caroline Emes | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Wilkinson | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Susanne Dack | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham John Evans | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carole Anne Moore | Trustee | 17 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Wood | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Kettless | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.