Financial history OLLIES HEROES

Charity Number: 1170873
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/02/2020 01/02/2021 01/02/2022 01/02/2023 01/02/2024
Total gross income £11.46k £3.52k £3.21k £11.00k £14.72k
Total expenditure £26.92k £3.99k £600 £16.82k £12.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A