Financial history PORTLAND YMCA RED TRIANGLE CLUB

Charity number: 1170011
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £78.76k £83.91k £90.69k £92.51k £102.29k
Total expenditure £87.06k £72.45k £78.07k £88.10k £100.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £27.00k £24.14k N/A N/A