Financial history THE JOSEPHINE AND JACK PROJECT

Charity Number: 1169241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £120.15k £31.86k £72.90k £143.18k £83.74k
Total expenditure £79.34k £75.80k £69.44k £95.51k £110.21k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A