MANCHESTER YEDAM CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Activities may include but are not restricted to: regular public worship, prayer, Bible study, preaching and teaching; evangelism and missionary work, locally, regionally, nationally and internationally; the teaching, encouragement, welcome and inclusion of young people; nurture and growth of Christian disciples
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Manchester City
Governance
- 05 December 2016: CIO registration
- MANCHESTER KOREAN CHURCH OF LOVE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eun Ho Kim | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
HYUN JIN KO | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
HYUNG JOON KIM | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.26k | £42.94k | £33.11k | £33.87k | £52.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.90k | £40.33k | £30.64k | £36.33k | £44.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 13 January 2022 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 75 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 05 DEC 2016 AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE PRESBYTERIAN DENOMINATION. IN FULFILLING THE OBJECT, THE CIO WILL ENGAGE IN A RANGE OF ACTIVITIES EITHER ON ITS OWN OR WITH OTHERS THAT WILL VARY FROM TIME TO TIME WITH ACTIVITIES BEING INITIATED, EXPANDED, OR CLOSED, AS APPROPRIATE. THE ACTIVITIES MAY INCLUDE BUT ARE NOT RESTRICTED TO: 3.1 REGULAR PUBLIC WORSHIP, PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING AND TEACHING; 3.2 THE COMMUNION OF THE LORD’S SUPPER WHICH SHALL NORMALLY BE OBSERVED AT LEAST ONCE A YEAR; 3.3 EVANGELISM AND MISSION, LOCALLY, REGIONALLY, NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY; 3.4 THE TEACHING, ENCOURAGEMENT, WELCOME AND INCLUSION OF YOUNG PEOPLE; 3.5 NURTURE AND GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES; 3.6 EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CHRISTIAN AND COMMUNITY SERVICE; 3.7 GIVING AND ENCOURAGING PASTORAL CARE; 3.8 PROVIDING RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT; 3.9 ENCOURAGING RELATIONSHIPS WITH AND SUPPORTING OTHER CHRISTIANS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT, THE CIO SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 LORRAINE ROAD
TIMPERLEY
ALTRINCHAM
WA15 7NA
- Phone:
- 07540073021
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window