Accounts and annual returns FRONTLINE VETERANS SUPPORT

Charity number: 1170275
Charity reporting is overdue by 1535 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 439 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 805 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 805 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1535 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1535 days