FAIR ACTION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity delivers educational workshops to schools, colleges and community trusts revolving around discrimination. We explore the influence and impact that culture has on different forms of discrimination relating to peoples' thoughts and behaviours i.e. stereotypes, prejudices and unconscious bias.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 January 2017: Standard registration
- FAIR FOOTBALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Twigger | Trustee | 28 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
GABRIELLA LYNN | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL CLAYTON | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
RAYMOND LYNN | Trustee | 21 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.10k | £9.93k | £22.65k | £15.40k | £26.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.75k | £37.52k | £12.59k | £23.67k | £10.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 51 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 May 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 June 2024 | 795 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 June 2024 | 1159 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 DEC 1899 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 06 JAN 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 14 AUG 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 OLD GLOUCESTER STREET
LONDON
WC1N 3AX
- Phone:
- 03001020005
- Email:
- raymond@fairaction.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window