THE FRIENDS OF DINOSAUR ISLE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We advance the education of the public in palaeontology and geology through a programme of lectures, open days and field trips. We run fund raising events supporting projects including the acquisition of specimens, purchasing equipment for the museum which enhances the development and display of the collection and support for moves to bring the museum under the management of a charitable trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 12 December 2016: CIO registration
- FODI CIO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bridgette Daphne Sibbick | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter David Pusey | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Charles George Hornett | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jeremy Agustus Frederick Lockwood | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA LOCKWOOD | Trustee | 12 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
SHAUN CHRISTOPHER ALEXANDER SMITH | Trustee | 10 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.77k | £1.05k | £560 | £570 | £1.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £171 | £0 | £1.91k | £20 | £2.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 12 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PALAEONTOLOGY AND GEOLOGY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BY ASSISTING DINOSAUR ISLE MUSEUM IN DEVELOPING AND DISPLAYING ITS COLLECTIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND PROMOTING THE STUDY OF THE ISLE OF WIGHT’S PALAEONTOLOGICAL COLLECTIONS AND FACILITATE CONTACT BETWEEN ALL INTERESTED PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
DINOSAUR ISLE
CULVER PARADE
SANDOWN
PO36 8QA
- Phone:
- 01983404344
- Email:
- hornettsnest@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window