Accounts and annual returns CHELMSFORD CITY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1168434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 29 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 30 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 01 May 2023 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 01 May 2023 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 27 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 May 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 May 2021 10 days late Download Open in new window