Financial history CHELMSFORD CITY YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1168434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £39.55k £32.03k £56.88k £54.64k £66.83k
Total expenditure £41.11k £31.67k £55.84k £50.47k £64.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A