Accounts and annual returns DEARNE VALLEY BULLDOGS ARLFC COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1168772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window