Trustees DEARNE VALLEY BULLDOGS ARLFC COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1168772

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEAN COOK | Chair | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Thompson | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Gill | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edina Wilkinson | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Marie Gill | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DUNCAN STUART HENDERSON | Trustee | 15 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.