Financial history THE LEXI MAY TRUST

Charity number: 1169177
Charity reporting is up to date (49 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £15.68k £26.79k £8.24k £25.25k £36.58k
Total expenditure £8.63k £9.88k £8.06k £15.99k £18.92k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A