THE BOUNCING BALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our object is to advance education and relieve need in Africa in such ways as the Trustees may from time to time determine, in particular, but not exclusively by the provision of educational programmes, learning resources and feeding programmes in schools and local communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Kenya
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 January 2017: CIO registration
- THE LEARNING TOGETHER FOUNDATION KENYA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ewan McNab | Chair | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rory Addison | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chris Orman | Trustee | 14 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.37k | £2.89k | £4.44k | £35.88k | £3.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £628 | £4.96k | £3.18k | £15.44k | £8.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 April 2024 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jan 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE NEED IN AFRICA IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES, LEARNING RESOURCES AND FEEDING PROGRAMMES IN SCHOOLS AND LOCAL COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Admiral's Yard
Station Road
Patchway
BRISTOL
BS34 6LR
- Phone:
- 0330 120 0720
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window