WORKPLACE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote modern and contemporary art through our gallery and through exhibitions in particular but not exclusively in Gateshead, Newcastle and the surrounding region; and advance the education and understanding of the public in modern and contemporary art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 24 August 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom Wilcox | Chair | 17 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maitreyi Maheshwari | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Dean Hughes | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ANTHONY SMITH | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH CARLTON | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT HAROLD FERRERS DEVEREUX | Trustee | 16 December 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £315.46k | £182.19k | £239.91k | £183.15k | £101.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £249.64k | £140.36k | £231.82k | £210.10k | £174.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.02k | £16.00k | N/A | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 DEC 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 15 AUG 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 JUL 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO: (1) PROMOTE MODERN AND CONTEMPORARY ART BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY AND EXHIBITION SPACES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN GATESHEAD, NEWCASTLE AND THE SURROUNDING REGION; AND (2) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC IN MODERN AND CONTEMPORARY ART, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) IMPROVING PUBLIC ACCESS; (B) DEVELOPING PUBLIC APPRECIATION; AND (C) FACILITATING THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF MODERN AND CONTEMPORARY ART.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Workplace Foundation
12 Blandford Square
Newcastle upon Tyne
Tyne & Wear
NE1 4HZ
- Phone:
- 0191 535 8115
- Email:
- info@workplacefoundation.art
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window