CHARISMA GYMNASTICS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of amateur sport by promoting the sport of gymnastics for young people living in the local area primarily women/girls; for the inhabitants of the London Boroughs - Southwark, Lambeth, Lewisham and Bromley. In particular: the provision of facilities for the coaching and performance of gymnastics , provision of grants to individuals to enable access to the facilities of the sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Bromley
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 08 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD GIBBONS | Chair | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE JEAN STIFF | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
KEITH COMBER | Trustee | 31 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.83k | £7.83k | £11.67k | £4.18k | £6.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.08k | £2.08k | £6.37k | £8.07k | £8.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 July 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 14 July 2024 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 22 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 08 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ADVANCEMENT OF AMATEUR SPORT BY PROMOTING THE SPORT OF GYMNASTICS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AGED UNDER 25 LIVING IN THE LOCAL AREA PRIMARILY YOUNG WOMEN/GIRLS, PRINCIPALLY FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF SOUTHWARK, LAMBETH, LEWISHAM AND BROMLEY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE: (A) PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE LEARNING, COACHING AND PERFORMANCE OF GYMNASTICS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING PHYSICAL LITERACY AMONG THE TARGET AUDIENCE. (B) PROVISION OF GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS TO ENABLE ACCESS TO THE FACILITIES OF THE SPORT AND COACHING OF THE SPORT OF GYMNASTICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 LAYHAMS ROAD
WEST WICKHAM
BR4 9HD
- Phone:
- 07764949707
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window