WARRINGTON VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offering a listening, caring, supportive, service for all Visually Impaired People in the Warrington area. Providing a suitable resource centre, offering equipment, advice, and information. Co Operating in and supporting the work of the official visitors of the Visually Impaired. Arranging suitable activities for Visually Impaired, with the object of improving their quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,181 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Warrington
Governance
- 25 October 2016: CIO registration
- 12 December 2016: Funds received from 223288 WARRINGTON, WIDNES AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR THE BL...
- WARRINGTON, WIDNES & DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Bates | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Kenneth Latham | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Parkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Welding | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffery Frederick Settle | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Walker | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £475.79k | £70.00k | £50.00k | £109.74k | £122.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.58k | £293.00k | £101.10k | £123.77k | £156.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £29.05k | £39.00k | £32.00k | £36.47k | £31.18k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Oct 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF BLIND AND VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN WARRINGTON IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) GIVING ASSISTANCE FINANCIAL, AND OTHERWISE TO CASES OF VISUAL IMPAIRED PERSONS WHO, BY REASON OF AGE, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS HAVE NEED OF SUCH HELP WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE (B) ARRANGING SUITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR VISUALLY IMPAIRED, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. (C) CO-OPERATING IN AND SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE OFFICIAL VISITORS OF THE VISUALLY IMPAIRED. (D) PROVIDING A SUITABLE RESOURCE CENTRE, OFFERING EQUIPMENT, ADVICE, AND INFORMATION. (E) OFFERING A LISTENING, CARING, SUPPORTIVE, SERVICE FOR ALL VISUALLY IMPAIRED IN THE WARRINGTON AND DISTRICT AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WARRINGTON VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE
FAIRFIELD STREET
WARRINGTON
CHESHIRE
WA1 3AJ
- Phone:
- 01925632700
- Email:
- info@warringtonvip.co.uk
- Website:
-
warringtonvip
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window