THE JEET AND KUKI SANDHU CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates in the UK, receiving donations and making payments to organisations for the advancement of health or saving of lives, in respect of disability and the prevention or relief of poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 01 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AMARJIT SINGH SANDHU | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RICKY SERNJEET SINGH SANDHU | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAMLINDER KAUR SANDHU | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUNDEEP SINGH SANDHU | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £2.00k | £25.40k | £22.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.97k | £280 | £27.80k | £21.68k | £20.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 115 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 31 May 2023 | 480 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 31 March 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 APR 2016
Charitable objects
2.2 THE "OBJECTS" ARE SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. 2.3 THE TRUSTEES SHALL PAY OR APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE APPLIED AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT THE INCOME AND IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES MAY FOR CHARITABLE REASONS ACCUMULATE ANY PART OF THE INCOME FOR SUCH PERIOD AS MAY BE PERMITTED BY LAW.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WELLINGTON ROAD
ST JOHN'S WOOD
LONDON
NW8 9SP
- Phone:
- 02078638333
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window