LOVE, JASMINE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Love, Jasmine provides support to family members directly affected by the loss of a child. We provide emotional and practical support and promote self-care to improve the emotional wellbeing of the whole family.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leanne Devine | Chair | 21 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Zoe Ainscough | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
IAN STRINGER | Trustee | 07 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH FURLONG | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
LEILA DYSON | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114.50k | £124.50k | £176.32k | £104.37k | £104.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £118.41k | £114.50k | £161.52k | £145.89k | £128.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £31.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Sep 2016 as amended on 19 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
1. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH OF FAMILIES WHO ARE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF A BEREAVEMENT OF A CHILD OF ANY AGE BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR PROFESSIONALS WHO ASSIST BEREAVED FAMILIES BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THEIR NEEDS BY WAY OF INFORMATION, TRAINING, GUIDANCE AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Tapton Way
Wavertree Business Village
Liverpool
L13 1DA
- Phone:
- 01514594779
- Email:
- enquiries@lovejasmine.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window