POSITIVE PLANET UK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Positive Planet UK is a dynamic non-profit organisation with its core purpose to: Develop and manage entrepreneurial programs for under-served demographics and communities; high-value sector value-chain initiatives; and social impact environmental green ventures in the UK and Africa; and Advance authentic, tangible diversity and economic financial inclusion initiatives (incl. women)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
- Senegal
Governance
- 24 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAWOOD ISHAQ SYED | Chair | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Scott George Mackin | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ali Malek | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
MATTEO STEFANEL | Trustee | 20 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £152.90k | £87.18k | £13.33k | £33.22k | £71.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.49k | £96.09k | £40.26k | £21.38k | £62.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 52 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 31 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 May 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 May 2023 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 NOV 2016
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF GLOBAL POVERTY BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, SERVICES, FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND HEALTHCARE TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO BECOME SELF SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Positive Planet UK
C/o Dentons LLP
1 Fleet Place
London
United Kingdom
EC4M 7WS
- Phone:
- +44 20 7320 4019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window