Trustees ForRefugees

Charity number: 1168435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Delia Nadarajah Chair 16 December 2022
None on record
Rachel Strudwick Trustee 10 March 2025
None on record
Alexandra Broniewski Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
Christopher McQuillan Trustee 01 March 2024
None on record
Merel Graeve Trustee 18 December 2023
None on record
Laura Darwish Trustee 25 May 2023
None on record
Ingrid Van Loo Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Nima Moradi Trustee 10 January 2022
None on record
Amber Bauer Trustee 26 July 2016
REFUGEE BIRIYANI & BANANAS
Received: On time
THE COLLECTIVE AID CHARITABLE FOUNDATION.
Recently registered