Trustees THE WINDSOR BOYS' SCHOOL BOAT CLUB
Charity number: 1168477

Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ryan Rees-Jones | Chair | 04 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sean Furness | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clare Warren | Trustee | 15 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Steve Gater | Trustee | 19 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Basham | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MORRELL | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Wilson | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN HENDERSON | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Oliver | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.