PCASO PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises regular meetings across our region for men diagnosed with prostate cancer and their families. Writes, produces and distributes literature and other types of information spreading awareness and information about prostate cancer. Conduct events offering free PSA tests to find men at risk of prostate cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Brighton And Hove
- Dorset
- East Sussex
- Hampshire
- Isle Of Wight
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- West Sussex
Governance
- 02 December 2016: CIO registration
- 20 July 2018: Funds received from 1095439 PCASO PROSTATE CANCER SUPPORT ORGANISATION
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Gerard Bowler | Trustee | 20 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Tompsett | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Keane | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Bonner | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Paul Simons | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Lance Allen | Trustee | 26 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Weir | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER JOHN BACON | Trustee | 02 December 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £97.96k | £22.75k | £38.40k | £105.95k | £180.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.03k | £15.99k | £35.99k | £103.52k | £119.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 02 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF PROSTATE CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, THOSE AT RISK OF PROSTATE CANCER AND THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN BEREAVED THROUGH PROSTATE CANCER BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO PROSTATE CANCER
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Hazelhurst Crescent
WORTHING
West Sussex
BN14 0HW
- Phone:
- 07842486689
- Email:
- secretary@pcaso.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window