MASJID AL-HUMERA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance further the Islamic faith by providing for the erection and maintenance in East London of a fitting mosque to be used by Muslims of London and from any other part of the country for worship according to the religion of Islam. The charity serves the community via a weekly sermon and classes in English along with weekend classes for Adults & Children
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 August 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MURTAZA KHAN | Chair | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ZAINEB RAFIQUE | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.59k | £66.90k | £123.86k | £144.40k | £265.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.98k | £54.70k | £75.08k | £233.20k | £96.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 September 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 04 September 2023 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 08 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 OCT 2013
Charitable objects
1. TO FURTHER THE ISLAMIC FAITH BY PROVIDING FOR THE ERECTION AND MAINTENANCE IN LONDON /ESSEX OF A FITTING MOSQUE TO BE USED BY MUSLIMS OF LONDON/ESSEX AND FROM ANY OTHER PART OF THE COUNTRY FOR WORSHIP ACCORDING TO THE RELIGION OF ISLAM. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY OF LONDON/ESSEX. 3. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR INDIVIDUALS PRIMARILY WITHIN (THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY) THE MUSLIM COMMUNITY WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, OR DISABILITY AND FINANCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITION OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
113 ROMFORD ROAD
LONDON
E15 4LY
- Phone:
- 07790183183
- Email:
- masjidalhumera@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window