Accounts and annual returns LA PETITE ECOLE DE CANTERBURY

Charity Number: 1171450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 28 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 March 2022 271 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 05 July 2020 5 days late Download Open in new window