Financial history PETER TATCHELL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £232.75k £261.68k £197.10k £269.93k £151.00k
Total expenditure £185.94k £163.03k £152.43k £193.38k £256.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.73k N/A N/A