Trustees PETER TATCHELL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEREMY HOOKE Chair 17 November 2011
None on record
Linda Riley Trustee 26 July 2021
None on record
Ros David Alexander Jackson Trustee 09 April 2019
None on record
JOHN EDWARD IRVON WATTS Trustee 22 July 2018
None on record
George Stewart Casley Trustee 08 June 2018
None on record
DEBORAH LANE-WINTER Trustee 16 September 2014
None on record