Accounts and annual returns NATIONAL STUDENT ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH

Charity number: 1169158
Charity reporting is overdue by 422 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 57 days
Annual return 10 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 422 days
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 422 days
Annual return 10 May 2022 12 March 2023 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 10 May 2021 25 March 2022 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 10 May 2020 07 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 10 May 2020 Not Required