NATIONAL STUDENT ASSOCIATION OF MEDICAL RESEARCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NSAMR provides learning and research opportunities for medical students through conferences and events, taster days in medicine, a research database, audit groups, mentoring and outreach opportunities and a student journal.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 May 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 September 2016: Standard registration
- NSAMR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Melika Akhbari | Trustee | 27 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rabii Aboulhosn | Trustee | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yuen Ting Evelyne Kiu | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MICHAEL LUNDIN | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SERENA BAHN - Chair | Trustee | 01 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/05/2018 | 10/05/2019 | 10/05/2020 | 10/05/2021 | 10/05/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.59k | £7.10k | £7.10k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.66k | £0 | £6.08k | £0 | £192 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 53 days | |
Annual return | 10 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 418 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 418 days | |
Annual return | 10 May 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2021 | 25 March 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 May 2020 | 07 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08 MAY 2016 AS AMENDED ON 11 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF MEDICAL STUDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY FOSTERING MEDICAL RESEARCH AND PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR MEDICAL STUDENTS TO DEVELOP RESEARCH SKILLS AND REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL THROUGH PROJECTS, LECTURES, MENTORING AND CONFERENCES
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Hammerman Avenue
Aberdeen
AB24 4SE
- Phone:
- 07492380280
- Email:
- chair@nsamr.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window