LOVE RUNNING CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity gives grants to relieve poverty and advance health both in the UK and overseas using funds raised in fundraising event where we encourage hundreds of people to enter the Bristol 10k road race under the Love Running banner.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JINADU | Chair | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ED MARSH | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|||||
KATHLEEN JINADU | Trustee | 16 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.97k | £11 | £93 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £84.26k | £161 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
A)THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY; AND B)THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS BY PROVIDING GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE SICKNESS OR PRESERVE HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
140 CRANBROOK ROAD
BRISTOL
BS6 7DD
- Phone:
- 01179466807
- Email:
- admin@loverunning.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window