ROYAL ARTILLERY SADDLE CLUB, ROYAL ARTILLERY BARRACKS, LARKHILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Royal Artillery Saddle Club is a charity which has been set up to help phase 2 soldiers and officers to learn to horse ride, it also provides a livery service to service personell and their dependants. They offer riding lessons to children to help bring in money to help with the upkeep of the horses and ponies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 26 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lt Col James Henry Adam Luck | Chair | 24 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maj Katie King | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joe Gregg | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Capt Alexander Hereford Lewis | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maj Claire Blakiston | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Maj Benjamin Murphy | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angus Harry Cameron | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £174.56k | £188.11k | £214.16k | £186.72k | £254.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £160.01k | £184.20k | £242.85k | £197.87k | £268.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.17k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 17 April 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 357 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 22 March 2024 | 357 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2024 | 717 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 17 March 2024 | 717 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2020
(These accounts |
31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 JAN 2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS 'THE PROMOTION OF EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF THE CROWN BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF FACILITIES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICE PERSONNEL'.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Artillery Saddle Club
Stirling Barracks
Larkhill
SALISBURY
SP4 8QT
- Phone:
- 01980845330
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window